Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2302 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023