Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2319 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023
Analysis January 23, 2023