Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Chapter 89
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (56-0-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (44-14-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|