Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023