Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-18-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-16-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (49-11-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House motion to amend
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
House MOE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Assigned to House MOE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|