Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023
Analysis January 23, 2023