Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2432 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023