Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2505 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-House Engrossed outdoor recreation coordinating commission; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023 CHAPTER 98 HOUSE BILL 2505 An Act repealing section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.16; relating to the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
1+House Engrossed outdoor recreation coordinating commission; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023 HOUSE BILL 2505 An Act repealing section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.16; relating to the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
2+
3+
24
35
46
57
68
79 House Engrossed outdoor recreation coordinating commission; continuation
810 State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
9-CHAPTER 98
1011 HOUSE BILL 2505
1112
1213 House Engrossed
1314
1415
1516
1617 outdoor recreation coordinating commission; continuation
18+
19+
1720
1821
1922
2023
2124
2225
2326
2427 State of Arizona
2528
2629 House of Representatives
2730
2831 Fifty-sixth Legislature
2932
3033 First Regular Session
3134
3235 2023
3336
3437
3538
3639
3740
3841
3942
40-CHAPTER 98
41-
42-
43-
4443 HOUSE BILL 2505
45-
46-
4744
4845
4946
5047
5148
5249 An Act
5350
5451
5552
5653 repealing section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.16; relating to the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission.
5754
5855
5956
6057
6158
6259 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
6360
6461
6562
6663 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.16, to read: START_STATUTE41-3031.16. Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission; termination July 1, 2031 A. The Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission terminates on July 1, 2031. B. Title 41, chapter 3, article 1.2 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission to provide for the distribution of federal and state monies for recreation projects in this state and to assist and advise the Arizona state parks board. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023.
6764
6865 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
6966
7067 Section 1. Repeal
7168
7269 Section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.
7370
7471 Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.16, to read:
7572
7673 START_STATUTE41-3031.16. Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission; termination July 1, 2031
7774
7875 A. The Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission terminates on July 1, 2031.
7976
8077 B. Title 41, chapter 3, article 1.2 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE
8178
8279 Sec. 3. Purpose
8380
8481 Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission to provide for the distribution of federal and state monies for recreation projects in this state and to assist and advise the Arizona state parks board.
8582
8683 Sec. 4. Retroactivity
8784
8885 Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023.
89-
90- APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 28, 2023. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023.
91-
92-
93-
94-
95-
96-
97-
98-APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 28, 2023.
99-
100-
101-
102-FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023.