Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2505 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/04/2023

                            House Engrossed   outdoor recreation coordinating commission; continuation           State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023           CHAPTER 98       HOUSE BILL 2505              An Act   repealing section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.16; relating to the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission.     (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)   

 

 

House Engrossed   outdoor recreation coordinating commission; continuation
State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
CHAPTER 98
HOUSE BILL 2505

House Engrossed

 

outdoor recreation coordinating commission; continuation

 

 

 

State of Arizona

House of Representatives

Fifty-sixth Legislature

First Regular Session

2023

 

 

 

CHAPTER 98

 

HOUSE BILL 2505

 

 

 

An Act

 

repealing section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.16; relating to the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission.

 

 

(TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)

 

 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.16, to read: START_STATUTE41-3031.16. Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission; termination July 1, 2031 A. The Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission terminates on July 1, 2031. B. Title 41, chapter 3, article 1.2 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission to provide for the distribution of federal and state monies for recreation projects in this state and to assist and advise the Arizona state parks board.  Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023. 

Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:

Section 1. Repeal

Section 41-3023.16, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.

Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.16, to read:

START_STATUTE41-3031.16. Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission; termination July 1, 2031

A. The Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission terminates on July 1, 2031.

B. Title 41, chapter 3, article 1.2 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE

Sec. 3. Purpose

Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona outdoor recreation coordinating commission to provide for the distribution of federal and state monies for recreation projects in this state and to assist and advise the Arizona state parks board. 

Sec. 4. Retroactivity

Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023.

       APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 28, 2023.   FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023. 

 

 

 

APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 28, 2023.

 

FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023.