Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2506 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-House Engrossed Arizona state parks board; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023 CHAPTER 99 HOUSE BILL 2506 An Act repealing section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.06; relating to the Arizona state parks board. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
1+House Engrossed Arizona state parks board; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023 HOUSE BILL 2506 An Act repealing section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.06; relating to the Arizona state parks board. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
22
33
44
55
66
77
88
99 House Engrossed Arizona state parks board; continuation
1010 State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023
11-CHAPTER 99
1211 HOUSE BILL 2506
1312
1413 House Engrossed
1514
1615
1716
1817 Arizona state parks board; continuation
1918
2019
2120
2221
2322
2423
2524
2625
2726
2827 State of Arizona
2928
3029 House of Representatives
3130
3231 Fifty-sixth Legislature
3332
3433 First Regular Session
3534
3635 2023
3736
3837
3938
4039
4140
4241
4342
43+HOUSE BILL 2506
4444
4545
46-CHAPTER 99
47-
48-
49-
50-HOUSE BILL 2506
5146
5247
5348
5449 An Act
5550
5651
5752
5853 repealing section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.06; relating to the Arizona state parks board.
5954
6055
6156
6257
6358
6459 (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE)
6560
6661
6762
6863 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.06, to read: START_STATUTE41-3031.06. Arizona state parks board; termination July 1, 2031 A. The Arizona state parks board terminates on July 1, 2031. B. Title 41, chapter 3, article 1.1 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona state parks board for the purposes, and to accomplish the objectives, prescribed in section 41-511.03, Arizona Revised Statutes. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023.
6964
7065 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona:
7166
7267 Section 1. Repeal
7368
7469 Section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed.
7570
7671 Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.06, to read:
7772
7873 START_STATUTE41-3031.06. Arizona state parks board; termination July 1, 2031
7974
8075 A. The Arizona state parks board terminates on July 1, 2031.
8176
8277 B. Title 41, chapter 3, article 1.1 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE
8378
8479 Sec. 3. Purpose
8580
8681 Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona state parks board for the purposes, and to accomplish the objectives, prescribed in section 41-511.03, Arizona Revised Statutes.
8782
8883 Sec. 4. Retroactivity
8984
9085 Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023.
91-
92- APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 28, 2023. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023.
93-
94-
95-
96-
97-
98-
99-
100-APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 28, 2023.
101-
102-
103-
104-FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023.