House Engrossed Arizona state parks board; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023 CHAPTER 99 HOUSE BILL 2506 An Act repealing section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.06; relating to the Arizona state parks board. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE) House Engrossed Arizona state parks board; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023 CHAPTER 99 HOUSE BILL 2506 House Engrossed Arizona state parks board; continuation State of Arizona House of Representatives Fifty-sixth Legislature First Regular Session 2023 CHAPTER 99 HOUSE BILL 2506 An Act repealing section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes; amending title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, by adding section 41-3031.06; relating to the Arizona state parks board. (TEXT OF BILL BEGINS ON NEXT PAGE) Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.06, to read: START_STATUTE41-3031.06. Arizona state parks board; termination July 1, 2031 A. The Arizona state parks board terminates on July 1, 2031. B. Title 41, chapter 3, article 1.1 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona state parks board for the purposes, and to accomplish the objectives, prescribed in section 41-511.03, Arizona Revised Statutes. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023. Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Arizona: Section 1. Repeal Section 41-3023.06, Arizona Revised Statutes, is repealed. Sec. 2. Title 41, chapter 27, article 2, Arizona Revised Statutes, is amended by adding section 41-3031.06, to read: START_STATUTE41-3031.06. Arizona state parks board; termination July 1, 2031 A. The Arizona state parks board terminates on July 1, 2031. B. Title 41, chapter 3, article 1.1 and this section are repealed on January 1, 2032. END_STATUTE Sec. 3. Purpose Pursuant to section 41-2955, subsection B, Arizona Revised Statutes, the legislature continues the Arizona state parks board for the purposes, and to accomplish the objectives, prescribed in section 41-511.03, Arizona Revised Statutes. Sec. 4. Retroactivity Sections 1 and 2 of this act apply retroactively to from and after July 1, 2023. APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 28, 2023. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023. APPROVED BY THE GOVERNOR APRIL 28, 2023. FILED IN THE OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 1, 2023.