Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023