House | 02/22/2023 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |