Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023