Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023