Senate | 04/03/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Senate COM Committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-8-0-0) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Assigned to House COM Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |