Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2555 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023