Senate
|
07/31/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (40-17-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House miscellaneous motion: Representative Payne motion that the House suspend Rule 32 and not withstanding any other House Rule and that HB2563 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (44-16-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-1-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|