Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2563 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023