Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate NREW Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Assigned to House LARA Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |