Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023