Senate
|
08/01/2023
|
Chapter 205
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
House final reading PASSED, voting: (56-0-4-0)
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
House concurs
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (53-5-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|