Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2670 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 14, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Chaptered

Bill August 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis August 1, 2023
Analysis July 28, 2023
Analysis June 26, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023