Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-6-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|