Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |