Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2808 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023