House
|
03/08/2023
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House LARA Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Assigned to Senate NREW Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2022
|
Prefile
|
|
|