LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1002
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1002
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1002
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 29, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 15, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
March 9, 2023
Analysis
March 3, 2023
Analysis
March 2, 2023
Analysis
February 15, 2023
Analysis
February 8, 2023
Analysis
January 27, 2023
Analysis
January 24, 2023