Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1041 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis January 27, 2023