House
|
03/20/2023
|
House HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Assigned to Senate COM Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|