Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1062 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023