Senate | 05/15/2023 | Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |