LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Arizona AZ
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1075
Draft Versions
AZ
Arizona Senate Bill SB1075
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Arizona 2023 Regular Session
Arizona Senate Bill SB1075
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 18, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 5, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 8, 2023
Analysis
May 15, 2023
Analysis
March 24, 2023