Arizona 2023 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1075 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/15/2023

                    Assigned to HHS 	AS PASSED BY ADD COW 
 
 
 
 
ARIZONA STATE SENATE 
Fifty-Sixth Legislature, First Regular Session 
 
AMENDED 
FACT SHEET FOR S.B. 1075 
 
optometry board; continuation 
(NOW: health boards; AHCCCS; continuation..) 
Purpose 
Continues the Arizona State Board of Optometry, the Arizona State Board of Dental 
Examiners (BODEX), the Arizona State Board of Massage Therapy, the Naturopathic Physicians 
Medical Board and the Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (AHCCCS). 
Background 
The Arizona State Board of Optometry is the regulatory body that oversees the licensing 
and practice of optometry in Arizona and consists of seven members appointed by the Governor. 
The Arizona State Board of Optometry terminates on July 1, 2023, unless continued by the 
Legislature (A.R.S. §§ 32-1702; 32-1704; and 41-3023.08).  
BODEX is the regulatory body that oversees the licensing and practice of dental care in 
Arizona, consisting of 11 members appointed by the Governor. BODEX terminates on July 1, 
2023, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. §§ 32-1203; 32-1207; and 41-3023.07). 
The Arizona State Board of Massage Therapy is the regulatory body that oversees the 
licensing and practice of massage therapy in Arizona and consists of five members appointed by 
the Governor. The Arizona State Board of Massage Therapy terminates on July 1, 2023, unless 
continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. §§ 32-4202; 32-4203; and 41-3023.10). 
The Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board is the regulatory body that oversees the 
licensing and practice of naturopathic medicine in Arizona, consisting of seven members appointed 
by the Governor. The Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board terminates on July 1, 2023, unless 
continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. §§ 32-1502; 32-1504; and 41-3023.05). 
AHCCCS serves as Arizona's Medicaid agency which offers qualifying Arizona residents' 
access to healthcare programs (AHCCCS). AHCCCS is led by a Governor-appointed Director and 
terminates on July 1, 2023, unless continued by the Legislature (A.R.S. §§ 36-2903; 36-2903.01; 
and 41-3023.01). 
The Joint Senate and House of Representatives Health and Human Services Committee of 
Reference (COR) held a public meeting on January 12, 2023, to review and evaluate the applicable 
boards' response to the sunset review factors and receive public testimony. The COR 
recommended that the Arizona State Board of Optometry be continued for six years (COR Report), 
BODEX be continued for two years (COR Report), the Arizona State Board of Massage Therapy 
be continued for two years (COR Report), the Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board be 
continued for six years (COR Report) and that AHCCCS be continued for six years (COR Report).   FACT SHEET – Amended  
S.B. 1075 
Page 2 
 
 
There is no anticipated fiscal impact to the state General Fund associated with this 
legislation.  
Provisions 
Arizona State Board of Optometry 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the Arizona State Board of Optometry until July 1, 2029.  
2. Repeals the Arizona State Board of Optometry on January 1, 2030.  
BODEX 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, BODEX until July 1, 2025. 
2. Repeals BODEX on January 1, 2026.  
Arizona State Board of Massage Therapy 
3. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the Arizona State Board of Massage Therapy until  
July 1, 2025. 
4. Repeals the Arizona State Board of Massage Therapy on January 1, 2026.  
Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board 
5. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board until  
July 1, 2029.  
6. Repeals the Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board on January 1, 2030.  
AHCCCS 
7. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, AHCCCS until July 1, 2029.  
8. Repeals AHCCCS on January 1, 2030.  
Miscellaneous 
9. Contains purpose statements.  
10. Becomes effective on the general effective date, with retroactive provisions as noted.  
Amendments Adopted by Additional Committee of the Whole 
1. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, the Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board and 
AHCCCS until July 1, 2029.  
2. Repeals the Naturopathic Physicians Medical Board and AHCCCS on January 1, 2030.   FACT SHEET – Amended  
S.B. 1075 
Page 3 
 
 
3. Continues, retroactive to July 1, 2023, BODEX and the Arizona State Board of Massage 
Therapy until July 1, 2025. 
4. Repeals BODEX and the Arizona State Board of Massage Therapy on January 1, 2026.  
Senate Action 
HHS 3/28/23 DP 6-0-1 
Prepared by Senate Research 
May 9, 2023 
MM/MC/slp