Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Override Governor's Veto
|
|
|
|
04/18/2023
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
04/12/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (22-8-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (49-8-3-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|