Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1091 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 7, 2023
Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023