Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1095 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis July 14, 2023
Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis June 21, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023