Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (31-24-4-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Assigned to House NREW Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senate COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Assigned to Senate COM Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|