Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023