House
|
05/15/2023
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (30-28-1-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Assigned to House MOE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Assigned to Senate GOV Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|