Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1142 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis January 30, 2023