Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023