House
|
04/03/2023
|
House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-6-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House APPROP Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House MOE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|