Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1170 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023