Senate | 03/03/2023 | Chapter 2 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Governor Signed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |