Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1171 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023

Chaptered

Bill March 6, 2023