House
|
03/28/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to House ED Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate consent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Assigned to Senate ED Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|