Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1179 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023