Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Chapter 157
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-2-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate concurs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee recommended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (46-9-4-0)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House HHS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|