Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1186 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis May 30, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023

Chaptered

Bill May 25, 2023